Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 36 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4663 Week
» 6401 Month
» 133844 Year
» 1799220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5004 m/e 04/1935
British Railways 45004 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five04/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 114
Works Number 220
To Service During 04/1935
Withdrawal During 09/1966
Service Life 31 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1935
2A   Rugby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11A   Carnforth 4w/e 04/11/1950
11A   Carnforth m/e 30/11/1950
10C   Patricroft 8w/e 11/07/1953
5B   Crewe South 4w/e 05/09/1953
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/11/1953
1E   Bletchley 4w/e 26/02/1955
9A   Longsight 4w/e 14/06/1958
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
5B   Crewe South w/e 06/01/1962
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11A Carnforth m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 10C Patricroft 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 01/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/06/1965 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. SLS/196508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5004
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 220
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45004    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45004    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev