Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 316 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2017 Week
» 10132 Month
» 137575 Year
» 1802951 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5019 m/e 05/1935
British Railways 45019 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five05/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 114
Works Number 235
To Service During 05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/05/1967
Service Life 32 yrs , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1935
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 24/02/1951
8A   Edge Hill m/e 28/02/1951
11A   Carnforth w/e 07/07/1951
11A   Carnforth 4w/e 17/07/1951
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/05/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 13/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 02/05/1959
WDN   w/e 13/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5019
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 235
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45019    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45019    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev