Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5026 m/e 09/1934
British Railways 45026 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five09/1934
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4571
To Service During 09/1934
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/10/1965
Service Life 31 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1934
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10C   Patricroft 3w/e 11/12/1948
10C   Patricroft w/e 18/12/1948
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/09/1950
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/10/1950
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 27/07/1963
10C   Fleetwood w/e 09/11/1963
10F   Rose Grove w/e 05/12/1964
9H   Patricroft w/e 06/02/1965
9D   Newton Heath w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 09/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 10C Fleetwood 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 3w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 09/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1943 Crewe Works Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. SLS/194401
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
16/04/1963 Crewe Works (Paint Shop and Outside) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5026
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4571
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45026    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
18/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
05/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
06/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
09/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45026    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev