Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1008 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18811 Week
» 71827 Month
» 191354 Year
» 3218207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5043 |
m/e |
10/1935 |
British Railways |
45043 |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5043 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4588 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45043 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45043 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|