Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3670 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17076 Week
» 70092 Month
» 189619 Year
» 3216472 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5054 |
m/e |
11/1935 |
British Railways |
45054 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4599 |
To Service |
During 11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/02/1968 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/05/1965 |
Cowlairs Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 42138/693, 44727/92, 44845/949/91/7, 45034/54/115/82/390, 76050, 73053/100, 80122, 90199; Outside: 45012/28, 45403/51, 73151, 76024. |
SLS/196506 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5054 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4599 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45054 |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
10/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45054 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|