Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 904 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5531 Week
» 7269 Month
» 134712 Year
» 1800088 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5055 m/e 11/1935
British Railways 45055 w/e 15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4600
To Service During 11/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1969

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1935
10C   Patricroft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/10/1952
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 21/05/1955
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/09/1962
27C   Southport w/e 20/07/1963
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 23/04/1966
50A   York (North) 4w/e 23/04/1966
8K   Bank Hall w/e 18/06/1966
8L   Aintree w/e 22/10/1966
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 13/05/1967
8A   Edge Hill w/e 07/10/1967
9H   Patricroft w/e 11/05/1968
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 06/07/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 4w/e 09/07/1966
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 07/10/1967
ALLOC 9H Patricroft w/e 11/05/1968
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall on 01/07/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5055
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4600
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C)    
15/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45055    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45055    
02/1969 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev