Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 16 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4643 Week
» 6381 Month
» 133824 Year
» 1799200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5057 m/e 12/1935
British Railways 45057 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five12/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4602
To Service During 12/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1967
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1935
2A   Rugby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10C   Patricroft w/e 07/07/1951
10C   Patricroft 4w/e 17/07/1951
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1955
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/09/1956
26A   Newton Heath w/e 27/07/1963
8C   Speke Junction w/e 05/10/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/06/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay) Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5057
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4602
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45057    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
12/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45057    
07/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev