Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1021 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24652 Week
» 89606 Month
» 292270 Year
» 3319123 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5061 |
m/e |
12/1935 |
British Railways |
45061 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/03/1953 |
Merchant Navy problems - \"foreign\" locos drafted in |
The temporary withdrawal of the 'Merchant Navy' engines for special examination, has led to the drafting of a number of strangers from other regions. Several V2 have been seen, among them 60829 an 60893; also the following Bl, Nos. 61133, 61192, 61354. From the L.M.R. come 45061, 45130 (latter seen passing Basingstoke on 30th May), and from W.R. at least, 70017 an 70024. There are certainly others, but at the time of going to press, no official notes have given details. |
SLS/195306 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5061 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4606 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45061 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
18/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45061 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|