Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5073 m/e 06/1935
British Railways 45073 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five06/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 122
Works Number 239
To Service During 06/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1969

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1935
5B   Crewe South on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 23/02/1957
3D   Aston 4w/e 10/08/1957
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/09/1957
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 30/11/1957
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 10/06/1961
8C   Speke Junction w/e 09/09/1961
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/07/1962
26A   Newton Heath w/e 27/07/1963
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 28/11/1964
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 28/10/1967
9K   Bolton w/e 13/04/1968
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 06/07/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 23/02/1957
LOAN 3D Aston 4w/e 10/08/1957
LOAN 3D Aston 2w/e 12/08/1957
EXLOAN 12A Carlisle Upperby 2w/e 12/08/1957
EXLOAN 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 11/11/1967
ALLOC 9K Bolton w/e 11/05/1968
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall on 01/07/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 44834/856, 45073/212/87/318. 45593 (repaint), 48340/723, 70005/11/40/5, 92013/32/71/90, D238, D249, D275, D296, D315/31/2/78/81, D1508/31/47/9/98, D1692, D1710, D8012 and D1991-1999, D1100; Electric shop: E3014/41/9/67, E26020/43, E27001; 'new' shop: D1533, D1617/36/81, D1754, D1803, D1970. Traverser area: D214, D243/92, D399, D5706/15/6, D8005, D1500/3/41/6/80, D160/83/94. 01700/51/64, D1840; Test area: D243/4, D1527/35/61/82. Old Cutting-up shop: D1515/73, D1788, D8016, E3045, D257. Waiting Works: 45350, 48683, 92020/208. Paint shop: 46235 (inside), D245, D252, D380, D1579, D1985-1990, D5709, 44871, 70051, 92107, 71000 (stored). SLS/196602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5073
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 239
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
21/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45073    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
28/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
13/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45073    
03/1969 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev