Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 177 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1246 Week
» 1246 Month
» 68108 Year
» 1733484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5078 m/e 03/1935
British Railways 45078 w/e 09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five03/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4621
To Service During 03/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/10/1965
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1935
25G   Farnley Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27C   Southport 4w/e 01/11/1952
27C   Southport 8w/e 29/11/1952
27C   Southport 8w/e 11/07/1953
24A   Accrington 8w/e 19/06/1954
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 09/01/1960
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 05/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 30/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/11/1952
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 13/06/1953
EXLOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 05/09/1964
WDN   w/e 30/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/01/1955 Sunderland Station On Saturday, 8th January, 1955, two football specials were run from Burnley and other Lancashire towns to Sunderland. Both trains were made up to 11 coach formation with a cafeteria coach included and one ran via the coast line through West Hartlepool and the other via Durham. The coast line train was hauled by Jubilee No. 45584 (24E) and the other train was hauled by Class 5 No. 45078 (24A). In addition, an excursion from Darlington was hauled by No. 61049 (51A). On the return trip, No. 45078 was given banking assistance out of Sunderland onto the Durham line by a G5 0-4-4T. On Tuesday, January 18th, 1955, Class Ll No. 67741, newly ex-works after overhaul, was the engine on the 9.0 a.m. slow from Sunderland to Newcastle. Austerity No. 90597 (36B), also ex-works, was observed on Saturday, 22nd January, 1955, passing through Sunderland on a south-bound goods. SLS/195503
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5078
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4621
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
09/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45078    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
05/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
30/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45078    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev