|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Crewe Works | During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
16/11/1950 | Midland Region Mishap | On 16th November, rebuilt 'Royal Scot' (of Bourne End notoriety) failed at Berkhamsted with the 8.30 p.m. 'Postal.' A bent connecting-rod made the engine immovable. After 2 hours' delay No. 45091 drew the train back either to Boxmoor or Watford, there being no cross-over between fast and slow roads at Berkhamsted; and the train eventually went through on the slow road behind No. 44904, at 11.34 p.m., 2½ hours late. At 1.0 a.m. a fitters' tool-van arrived, and after much hammering in the dead of night succeeded in making No. 46157 movable; and she was towed away at 2 a.m., after blocking the down fast line for five hours, during which time all down traffic had to use the slow road from Bourne End. | SLS/195101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5091 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4634 |
||
11/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
22/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Preston (10B) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B) | ||
03/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45091 | ||
05/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (2C) | ||
19/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
02/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
08/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
24/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
10/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45091 | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |