Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 274 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1975 Week
» 10090 Month
» 137533 Year
» 1802909 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5092 m/e 04/1935
British Railways 45092 w/e 01/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five04/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4635
To Service During 04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/12/1967
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1935
20A   Holbeck (MR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5A   Crewe North w/e 05/03/1949
2A   Rugby w/e 29/04/1950
1A   Willesden 4w/e 31/12/1950
11A   Carnforth 4w/e 23/02/1952
6J   Holyhead 4w/e 14/06/1958
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/10/1958
5B   Crewe South w/e 02/04/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/06/1960
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/06/1962
24L   Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 16/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 01/01/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 29/04/1950
ALLOC 1A Willesden m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 11A Carnforth 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 5B Crewe South 5w/e 30/04/1960
EXLOAN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 16/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202
11/12/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. SLS/196701
16/02/1968 CarnforthMPD (Out of use) Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. SLS/196803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5092
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4635
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
01/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45092    
05/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
29/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
25/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
16/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45092    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev