Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 279 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1980 Week
» 10095 Month
» 137538 Year
» 1802914 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5120 m/e 06/1935
British Railways 45120 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five06/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4663
To Service During 06/1935
Withdrawal During 06/1967
Service Life 32 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1935
28A   Motherwell on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
60A   Inverness w/e 10/12/1949
68A   Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 27/12/1952
27B   Aintree w/e 18/05/1963
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 23/11/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 28A Motherwell 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 60A Inverness w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   w/e 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
27/08/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. SLS/194910
01/10/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 40570/73, 40621, 40907, 909, 41177, 2688, 42689, 2695, 42699, 2800/50, 42906, 3922, 44193, 4792, 44924, 4957, 44979/98, 45008/11/49, 45119/20/25/56/61/76, 45213/66, 45361, 45459, 5473, 45644/46/93, 45714/15/32, 47540, 14451/83, 54506, 54648, 15139, 55359, 16163/73, 16326/56/70/73, 17240/85, 17311, 57372, 57604/19, 17671, 17950. (14451's built-up chimney now removed). SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5120
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4663
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
19/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45120    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45120    
11/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev