Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 293 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1994 Week
» 10109 Month
» 137552 Year
» 1802928 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5147 m/e 06/1935
British Railways 45147 w/e 15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five06/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1188
To Service During 06/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/05/1967
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1935
10C   Patricroft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden 4w/e 04/12/1954
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/09/1957
1A   Willesden 8w/e 05/10/1957
2E   Northampton w/e 22/11/1958
1A   Willesden w/e 19/11/1960
8C   Speke Junction w/e 14/01/1961
6J   Holyhead w/e 10/06/1961
2E   Northampton w/e 23/09/1961
1E   Bletchley w/e 04/11/1961
5C   Stafford w/e 07/03/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 24/07/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 20/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 23/08/1947
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 27/11/1954
LOAN 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/09/1957
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 07/08/1965
WDN   w/e 20/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202
03/05/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5147
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1188
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C)    
15/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45147    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
20/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45147    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev