Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4090 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17496 Week
» 70512 Month
» 190039 Year
» 3216892 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5149 |
m/e |
06/1935 |
British Railways |
45149 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1190 |
To Service |
During 06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/06/1968 |
Service Life |
33 yrs , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1969 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5149 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1190 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45149 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45149 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|