Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 299 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2000 Week
» 10115 Month
» 137558 Year
» 1802934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5181 m/e 09/1935
British Railways 45181 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five09/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1222
To Service During 09/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/01/1966
Service Life 30 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1935
5B   Crewe South on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8A   Edge Hill w/e 27/11/1948
8A   Edge Hill 3w/e 11/12/1948
2A   Rugby 4w/e 24/02/1951
2A   Rugby m/e 28/02/1951
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 24/03/1951
6J   Holyhead w/e 23/06/1962
8C   Speke Junction w/e 13/10/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 22/06/1963
24L   Carnforth w/e 13/07/1963
8C   Speke Junction w/e 14/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 15/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 2A Rugby m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 24/03/1951
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 15/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5181
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1222
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45181    
27/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
15/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45181    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev