Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 47 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 865 Week
» 17816 Month
» 170769 Year
» 1836145 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5209 m/e 11/1935
British Railways 45209 w/e 21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1250
To Service During 11/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1935
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23A   Bank Hall w/e 15/05/1948
23C   Southport w/e 30/10/1948
25A   Wakefield w/e 01/01/1949
24A   Accrington w/e 15/09/1951
24A   Accrington 4w/e 06/10/1951
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 06/09/1952
24A   Accrington 4w/e 03/10/1953
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 28/11/1953
24H   Hellifield w/e 02/02/1963
24L   Carnforth w/e 22/06/1963
10J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 07/12/1963
10A   Carnforth w/e 18/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23A Bank Hall w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 01/01/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 24H Hellifield 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 10J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 02/05/1964
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5209
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1250
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
15/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (23A)    
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
01/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
21/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45209    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
02/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hellifield (24H)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45209    
10/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev