Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 296 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1997 Week
» 10112 Month
» 137555 Year
» 1802931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5210 m/e 11/1935
British Railways 45210 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1251
To Service During 11/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/04/1966
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1935
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A   Newton Heath w/e 13/05/1950
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 04/11/1950
25F   Low Moor 4w/e 31/12/1950
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
25F   Low Moor 4w/e 17/05/1952
25F   Low Moor 8w/e 14/06/1952
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 08/09/1956
27B   Aintree w/e 17/03/1962
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/05/1963
10B   Blackpool Central w/e 01/08/1964
10J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 15/08/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 21/11/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 07/08/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 02/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 13/05/1950
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 25F Low Moor m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 10B Blackpool Central 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 10J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 05/09/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/08/1965
WDN   w/e 02/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5210
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1251
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
20/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45210    
13/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (10B)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J)    
21/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
02/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45210    
07/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev