Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5221 m/e 11/1935
British Railways 45221 w/e 28/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1262
To Service During 11/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Service Life 32 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1935
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 02/12/1950
15C   Leicester Midland 4w/e 24/02/1951
15C   Leicester Midland 4w/e 23/02/1952
15D   Bedford 4w/e 26/01/1957
16A   Nottingham w/e 23/01/1960
17A   Derby w/e 17/09/1960
21A   Saltley w/e 04/03/1961
16A   Nottingham w/e 06/04/1963
16C   Derby w/e 23/11/1963
16D   Nottingham w/e 27/06/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/03/1965
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 26/06/1965
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 07/10/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 16A Nottingham m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 14B Kentish Town m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 15C Leicester Midland m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 5w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 07/10/1967
WDN 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5221
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1262
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
28/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45221    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45221    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev