Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5225 m/e 08/1936
British Railways 45225 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five08/1936
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1280
To Service During 08/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/10/1967
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1936
23A   Bank Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
19A   Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 09/09/1950
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 04/11/1950
6B   Mold Junction w/e 23/01/1960
6H   Bangor w/e 23/04/1960
5A   Crewe North w/e 16/09/1961
5D   Stoke w/e 23/06/1962
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 24/11/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 14/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central w/e 10/05/1947
EXLOAN 23A Bank Hall w/e 28/06/1947
LOAN 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 02/09/1950
EXLOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 28/10/1950
LOAN 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 01/12/1962
WDN 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 14/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/04/1962 Crewe South MPD (Ex Works) Waiting Works on 5B: 12009/19, 42677/8, 43681, 44364, 45418, 46144/9, 46205/7/10, 47213, 47547, 48964, 49158, 70016. Ex Works on 5B: 45116, 45225, 46117, 48732. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5225
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1280
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45225    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
24/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
14/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45225    
07/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev