Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 20 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4647 Week
» 6385 Month
» 133828 Year
» 1799204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5255 m/e 10/1936
British Railways 45255 w/e 21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five10/1936
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1310
To Service During 10/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1969

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1936
5B   Crewe South on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7C   Holyhead w/e 28/05/1949
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 01/10/1949
7A   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 22/03/1952
6H   Bangor 4w/e 19/04/1952
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 12/07/1952
6J   Holyhead 4w/e 06/11/1954
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 01/01/1955
26F   Patricroft w/e 27/06/1959
26A   Newton Heath w/e 14/01/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7C Holyhead w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 01/10/1949
LOAN 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 22/03/1952
LOAN 6H Bangor 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 12/07/1952
LOAN 6J Holyhead 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5255
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1310
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
21/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45255    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (7C)    
01/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45255    
02/1969 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev