Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5267 |
m/e |
10/1936 |
British Railways |
45267 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1322 |
To Service |
During 10/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1967 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5267 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1322 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45267 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (15D) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16B) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16B) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45267 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|