Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 952 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18755 Week
» 71771 Month
» 191298 Year
» 3218151 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5321 |
m/e |
02/1937 |
British Railways |
45321 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1376 |
To Service |
During 02/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1967 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/10/1952 |
5MT at Potters Bar! |
On Friday, 10th October, No. 45321 (8B) was noted on an Up goods train passing Potters Bar; this is believed to be the first occasion an L.M.S. Class 5 has been recorded working on the G.N. main line at this point. |
SLS/195212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5321 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1376 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45321 |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45321 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|