Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5329 m/e 03/1937
British Railways 45329 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five03/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1384
To Service During 03/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/11/1966
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1937
10C   Patricroft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 01/01/1955
10C   Patricroft 8w/e 16/07/1955
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 13/08/1955
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 20/06/1959
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 18/06/1960
8C   Speke Junction w/e 24/09/1960
6J   Holyhead w/e 23/06/1962
8C   Speke Junction w/e 15/09/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 22/06/1963
24L   Carnforth w/e 13/07/1963
8C   Speke Junction w/e 14/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 12/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 10C Patricroft 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 12/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/02/1958 LMR regional adjustments In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. SLS/195802

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5329
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1384
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45329    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
12/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45329    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev