Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2044 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19847 Week
» 72863 Month
» 192390 Year
» 3219243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5331 |
m/e |
03/1937 |
British Railways |
45331 |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5331 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1386 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45331 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45331 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|