Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5333 m/e 03/1937
British Railways 45333 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five03/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1388
To Service During 03/1937
Withdrawal During 06/1966
Service Life 29 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1937
11A   Carnforth 4w/e 22/06/1946
11A   Carnforth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B   Preston w/e 09/07/1949
10B   Preston 5w/e 16/07/1949
11A   Carnforth w/e 20/08/1949
8A   Edge Hill w/e 30/09/1950
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 07/10/1950
8E   Brunswick w/e 27/10/1951
1A   Willesden 4w/e 25/01/1958
16A   Nottingham w/e 20/06/1959
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 12/12/1959
21A   Saltley w/e 18/05/1963
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 22/06/1963
16B   Annesley w/e 24/10/1964
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/10/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1966
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 25/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 20/08/1949
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 8E Brunswick w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 16B Annesley 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 06/11/1965
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 02/07/1966
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 09/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5333
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1388
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A)    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45333    
09/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
20/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
27/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16B)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45333    
25/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
10/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev