Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 333 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2034 Week
» 10149 Month
» 137592 Year
» 1802968 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5340 m/e 04/1937
British Railways 45340 w/e 25/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five04/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1395
To Service During 04/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/04/1967
Service Life 30 yrs , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1937
25G   Farnley Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 17/12/1949
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 3w/e 14/01/1950
24K   Preston w/e 08/11/1958
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/11/1959
24K   Preston w/e 15/04/1961
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 01/07/1961
8A   Edge Hill w/e 21/10/1961
24L   Carnforth w/e 23/06/1962
12C   Barrow in Furness w/e 06/03/1965
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 18/09/1965
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/12/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 22/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 24K Preston 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 24K Preston 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 12C Barrow in Furness 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   w/e 22/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5340
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1395
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
25/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45340    
17/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
08/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
18/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
22/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45340    
07/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev