Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 15 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4642 Week
» 6380 Month
» 133823 Year
» 1799199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5373 m/e 06/1937
British Railways 45373 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five06/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1428
To Service During 06/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/09/1967
Service Life 30 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1937
10B   Preston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10C   Patricroft w/e 28/05/1949
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 30/01/1954
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 27/03/1954
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/06/1959
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 20/07/1963
10J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 14/09/1963
10A   Carnforth w/e 23/04/1966
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 01/04/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 23/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 14/02/1948
EXLOAN 10B Preston w/e 06/03/1948
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 10J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN   w/e 23/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5373
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1428
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45373    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
01/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
23/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45373    
10/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev