Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 604 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3530 Week
» 5268 Month
» 132711 Year
» 1798087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5380 m/e 07/1937
British Railways 45380 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five07/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1435
To Service During 07/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/03/1965
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1937
8A   Edge Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 07/11/1959
8A   Edge Hill w/e 09/04/1960
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 31/12/1960
6J   Holyhead w/e 23/06/1962
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 15/09/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/03/1963
26A   Newton Heath w/e 27/07/1963
9A   Longsight w/e 24/08/1963
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 20/02/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 27/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 9A Longsight 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 13/03/1965
WDN   w/e 27/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5380
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1435
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45380    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
24/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
20/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
27/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45380    
12/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev