Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3618 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17024 Week
» 70040 Month
» 189567 Year
» 3216420 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5390 |
m/e |
08/1937 |
British Railways |
45390 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1445 |
To Service |
During 08/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/08/1968 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/05/1965 |
Cowlairs Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 42138/693, 44727/92, 44845/949/91/7, 45034/54/115/82/390, 76050, 73053/100, 80122, 90199; Outside: 45012/28, 45403/51, 73151, 76024. |
SLS/196506 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5390 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1445 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45390 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
23/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45390 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|