Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 16 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4643 Week
» 6381 Month
» 133824 Year
» 1799200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5394 m/e 08/1937
British Railways 45394 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five08/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1449
To Service During 08/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/07/1968
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1968 at Cohens (Cargo Fleet)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1937
2A   Rugby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden 4w/e 21/04/1956
2A   Rugby 4w/e 11/08/1956
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 06/10/1956
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 18/06/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/09/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 31/12/1960
10J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 18/07/1964
10A   Carnforth w/e 23/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 20/07/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 10J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 20/07/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/02/1958 LMR regional adjustments In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. SLS/195802
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5394
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1449
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45394    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
20/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45394    
12/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Cargo Fleet    

prev prev