Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1680 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19483 Week
» 72499 Month
» 192026 Year
» 3218879 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5396 |
m/e |
08/1937 |
British Railways |
45396 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1451 |
To Service |
During 08/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Tue 01/02/1966 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5396 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1451 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45396 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
01/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
01/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45396 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|