|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1958 | LMR regional adjustments | In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. | SLS/195802 |
16/04/1963 | Crewe Shed (On Shed Ex Works) | On Shed Ex Works: 45252, 45409, 45562. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5409 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1464 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
05/11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45409 | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (2E) | ||
27/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) | ||
08/08/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
26/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
30/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45409 | ||
12/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |