Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15669 Week
» 68685 Month
» 188212 Year
» 3215065 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5416 |
m/e |
10/1937 |
British Railways |
45416 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1471 |
To Service |
During 10/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/07/1965 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5416 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1471 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45416 |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
18/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
11/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16B) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45416 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|