Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1841 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15247 Week
» 68263 Month
» 187790 Year
» 3214643 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5430 |
m/e |
11/1937 |
British Railways |
45430 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1485 |
To Service |
During 11/1937 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
28 yrs , 10 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
LOAN |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
06/11/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5430 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1485 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45430 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45430 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|