Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5431 m/e 11/1937
British Railways 45431 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1486
To Service During 11/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/12/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 30 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1937
1A   Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2A   Rugby w/e 01/10/1949
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 10/09/1955
1A   Willesden 4w/e 06/09/1958
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 27/12/1958
24L   Carnforth w/e 27/06/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 02/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 01/10/1949
LOAN 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 08/10/1955
LOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 06/09/1958
EXLOAN 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/02/1958 LMR regional adjustments In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. SLS/195802
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5431
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1486
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
02/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45431    
01/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45431 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
05/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev