Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 484 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19395 Week
» 84349 Month
» 287013 Year
» 3313866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5447 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
British Railways |
45447 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1502 |
To Service |
During 12/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/08/1968 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5447 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1502 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45447 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
03/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45447 |
|
|
12/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|