Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 379 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7062 Week
» 18108 Month
» 18108 Year
» 1683484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5471 m/e 12/1938
British Railways 45471 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five12/1938
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 142
To Service During 12/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1938
31A St Rollox (Balornock) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67E Dumfries 5w/e 30/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 03/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67E Dumfries 4w/e 13/02/1965
WDN   w/e 03/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Inverness Lochgorm Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 4785, 45053, 45471. SLS/194908
31/10/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40186, 590, 617/27, 41175, 1184, 2195, 2694, 2746, 42809, 2831, 4794, 44960/92, 45007/09/87, 45123/24/38, 45389, 45452/69, 45471/72/82/86/92, 46221, 14472, 15140, 15213, 16243/59, 56261, 16306/53/55, 17246, 17339/64, 57556, 17602/26/40/68. St. Rollox have now started using the B.R. crest, but as yet none of the ex-C.R. locomotives has received one. Two of the diesel railcars are laid up at St. Rollox, and the third at Hamilton. It is rumoured that one is to be broken up SLS/194912
17/05/1963 Glasgow (St. Rollox) Works (Waiting Works) Erecting Shop: 42125, 42264/5, 44991/4, 45016/214/45/365/472, D3005, D3210, D3544, D5121/9, D6110/33, D8076, D8112, D264. Waiting Works: 44796, 44956, 45478, 45356, 45423, 45471. Ex-Works: 44720, D366. Diesel Test House: D3410. Works Shunters: D3408, D3739, D3904. Stored: 45178, D6100/1/2/6/7/20/4/5/7/30. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5471
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A)    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45471    
30/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (67E)    
03/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45471    

prev prev