30/09/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-Nos. *40667 (3778) 7/9; 42878 (4171) 5/9; 44878 (9362) 20/9; 44968 (10593) 5/9; 44979 (10604) 8/9; 45015 (9473) 29/9; 45155 (10547) 10/9; 45156 (9260) 14/9; 45169 (9169) 21/9; 45173 (9277) 15/9; 45213 (9317) 19/9; 45355 (9827) 9/9; 45366 (9602) 13/9; 45443 (9271) 6/9; *45461 (9717) 8/9; 45477 (9823) 22/9; 45478 (9824) 22/9; 45643 (10503) 19/9; *54453 (6052) 24/9; 54649 (2680) 13/9; 55166 9/9; *55159 15/9; 55201 21/9; 55212 8/9; 56340 28/9; 56368 29/9; *57247 (885) 24/9. *Retains L.M.S. on tank or tender sides. With the exception of Nos. 45461, 54453 and 54649, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number-plates. Commencing on 5/9, the colour of the numbers and letters was changed from white to cream; the original dimensions being retained. Several locomotives have been treated with a full paint schedule-three undercoats, one coat of enamel and two coats of varnish. The first to be dealt with was No. **57360 (876), which was completed in the Erecting Shop during W/E 11/9, but subsequent engines have been sent to the Varnish Shop for completion as follows:-Nos. **55233 25/9; **57236 (6029) 14/9; **57238 (990) 25/9; **57309 (947) 16/9; **57368 (6005) 23/9; **57651 (1732) 21/9. On 30/9 a new departure was made when No. **40188 received 8' numerals and 6' letters. **Fitted with new smokebox numberplates. |
SLS/194811 |
30/11/1949 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 4789, 45136, 45478, 54473. |
SLS/195001 |
18/02/1963 |
Glasgow St. Rollox (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop. 42271, 42800/3, 44923/57, 45423/56/60/78/99, D3730/8, D3916, D5337/69, D5121/3, D6105/23/4/31, Test House: D3280, D6103. Paint Shop-stored: D6101/6/22/5/7/30. Ex-Works: 45357/62, 45496. Awaiting Works: 42195, 44980, D6100 fire damage, D6107/14. Works shunters. D2772, D3542. D6123 was being prepared for Paxman Works, Colchester. |
SLS/196303 |
14/04/1963 |
St. Rollox MPD (ex Works) |
in steam-60004/31/94, 60955 and 60525 under repair, and stored-42877, 45119, 45718/28/9/31; ex Works-44931, 45309 an 45478. |
SLS/196304 |
17/05/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: 42125, 42264/5, 44991/4, 45016/214/45/365/472, D3005, D3210, D3544, D5121/9, D6110/33, D8076, D8112, D264. Waiting Works: 44796, 44956, 45478, 45356, 45423, 45471. Ex-Works: 44720, D366. Diesel Test House: D3410. Works Shunters: D3408, D3739, D3904. Stored: 45178, D6100/1/2/6/7/20/4/5/7/30. |
SLS/196304 |