|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Inverness Lochgorm Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 4784, 45191, 17950. | SLS/194907 |
06/07/1949 | Inverness MPD | On 6/7 No. 57955 was on the shed, whilst No. 57956 worked out to the north. On the same day, No. 57954 was at Helmsdale and Nos. 57950/51 were on the Kyle of Lochalsh line. The last 'Clan,' No. 54767, worked in from Tain and the following day worked to Kyle of Lochalsh. | SLS/194909 |
01/10/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 40570/73, 40621, 40907, 909, 41177, 2688, 42689, 2695, 42699, 2800/50, 42906, 3922, 44193, 4792, 44924, 4957, 44979/98, 45008/11/49, 45119/20/25/56/61/76, 45213/66, 45361, 45459, 5473, 45644/46/93, 45714/15/32, 47540, 14451/83, 54506, 54648, 15139, 55359, 16163/73, 16326/56/70/73, 17240/85, 17311, 57372, 57604/19, 17671, 17950. (14451's built-up chimney now removed). | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as Highland Railway Number 75 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3286 |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 17950 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A) | ||
25/06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 57950 | ||
07/1950 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
08/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 57950 |