Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2301 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15707 Week
» 68723 Month
» 188250 Year
» 3215103 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5561 |
on |
13/07/1934 |
British Railways |
45561 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1962 |
Burton MPD |
Only a few Jubilees are working now from this depot; 45557/61, 45610/1/2/4/49/67/8 an 45712 were in store in the open on llth Nov. whilst 45685 was shed pilot. 45626 was booked to proceed to Annesley to replace 46143 (which had failed the previous week on an up Nottingham express). |
SLS/196212 |
29/11/1964 |
Derby MPD (Stored) |
Stored: 47461, 45561; Waiting works: D176, 12032. |
SLS/196501 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/07/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5561, name: SASKATCHEWAN Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24119 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45561 |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F) |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
20/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45561 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|