Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2246 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15652 Week
» 68668 Month
» 188195 Year
» 3215048 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5587 |
on |
08/12/1934 |
British Railways |
45587 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
08/12/1934 |
BARODA |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/12/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5587, name: BARODA Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24145 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45587 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45587 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|