Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4090 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23001 Week
» 87955 Month
» 290619 Year
» 3317472 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5601 |
on |
13/04/1935 |
British Railways |
45601 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
13/04/1935 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
1B |
|
Camden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
1A |
|
Willesden |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5601, name: BRITISH GUIANA Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24159 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45601 |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45601 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|