Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2278 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20081 Week
» 73097 Month
» 192624 Year
» 3219477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5609 |
on |
17/07/1934 |
British Railways |
45609 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Fri 17/07/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 02/09/1960 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/07/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5609, name: GILBERT AND ELLIS ISLANDS Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45609 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45609 |
|
|