|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1961 | Crewe Works (Works Sidings) | Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. | SLS/196104 |
25/11/1961 | Burton MPD | Eighteen Jubilees were transferred here on 25th November in exchange for Class 4Fs, although it is believed all are to be stored viz. 45557/79/85/98, 45610/1/2/5/8/20/6/36/41/8/9/50/67/8. | SLS/196201 |
31/10/1962 | Burton MPD | Only a few Jubilees are working now from this depot; 45557/61, 45610/1/2/4/49/67/8 an 45712 were in store in the open on llth Nov. whilst 45685 was shed pilot. 45626 was booked to proceed to Annesley to replace 46143 (which had failed the previous week on an up Nottingham express). | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5612 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45612 | ||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
18/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
26/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
28/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45612 | ||
04/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |