Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19370 Week
» 72386 Month
» 191913 Year
» 3218766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5614 |
on |
09/08/1934 |
British Railways |
45614 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 09/08/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 11/01/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1962 |
Burton MPD |
Only a few Jubilees are working now from this depot; 45557/61, 45610/1/2/4/49/67/8 an 45712 were in store in the open on llth Nov. whilst 45685 was shed pilot. 45626 was booked to proceed to Annesley to replace 46143 (which had failed the previous week on an up Nottingham express). |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/08/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5614, name: LEEWARD ISLANDS Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45614 |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45614 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|