|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1949 | Crewe Works | 21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' | SLS/194909 |
01/02/1959 | Rugby Works | 42677(5A), 45256(8A), 45615/77, 48711 (8E), 73157(14D), 80082(1E), 92032(16D), 90080(2F). | SLS/195903 |
31/10/1959 | Leicester. Mid. MPD | Leicester Midland (15C) now has six Jubilees on its allocation viz. 45585, 45615/6/22/36/50, having gained some Kentish Town 'diagrams'. | SLS/196003 |
25/06/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. | SLS/196108 |
25/11/1961 | Burton MPD | Eighteen Jubilees were transferred here on 25th November in exchange for Class 4Fs, although it is believed all are to be stored viz. 45557/79/85/98, 45610/1/2/5/8/20/6/36/41/8/9/50/67/8. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/08/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5615, name: MALAY STATES Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45615 | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
08/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
23/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
18/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45615 | ||
15/02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |