|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
25/11/1961 | Burton MPD | Eighteen Jubilees were transferred here on 25th November in exchange for Class 4Fs, although it is believed all are to be stored viz. 45557/79/85/98, 45610/1/2/5/8/20/6/36/41/8/9/50/67/8. | SLS/196201 |
31/10/1962 | Burton MPD | Only a few Jubilees are working now from this depot; 45557/61, 45610/1/2/4/49/67/8 an 45712 were in store in the open on llth Nov. whilst 45685 was shed pilot. 45626 was booked to proceed to Annesley to replace 46143 (which had failed the previous week on an up Nottingham express). | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/11/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5667, name: JELLICOE Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45667 | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F) | ||
19/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
18/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
26/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K) | ||
23/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45667 | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |