Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17418 Week
» 70434 Month
» 189961 Year
» 3216814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5737 |
on |
23/11/1936 |
British Railways |
45737 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
23/11/1936 |
ATLAS |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 23/11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/05/1964 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5737, name: ATLAS Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45737 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
11/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
13/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45737 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|