Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6005 |
on |
19/08/1932 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
5509 |
on |
10/08/1934 |
British Railways |
45509 |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Patriot |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 19/08/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/08/1961 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,249,852 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/08/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6005, name: THE DERBYSHIRE YEOMANRY Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
10/08/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5509 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45509 |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45509 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|